Assembly
|
02/03/2014
|
From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/31/2014
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on B.,P. & C.P. and V.A. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|