|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 240, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1889.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1592.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|