LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB720
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB720
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB720
Compare Versions
AB720 Chaptered October 8, 2013
AB720 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB720 Amended September 6, 2013
AB720 Amended September 3, 2013
AB720 Amended July 9, 2013
AB720 Amended June 24, 2013
AB720 Amended May 24, 2013
AB720 Amended April 11, 2013
AB720 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB720 Chaptered October 8, 2013
AB720 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB720 Amended September 6, 2013
AB720 Amended September 3, 2013
AB720 Amended July 9, 2013
AB720 Amended June 24, 2013
AB720 Amended May 24, 2013
AB720 Amended April 11, 2013
AB720 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare