|
09/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 394, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/19/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/18/2013
|
Enrolled measure version corrected.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2013
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3064.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 3079.).
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2254.).
|
|
|
|
09/04/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2013
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read third time, passed, and to Assembly. Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2013
|
In Senate. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2013
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Assembly. Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 1886.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 3).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 1456.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|