BILL NUMBER: AB 739AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 22, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 17, 2014 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 9, 2014 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 15, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Salas Members Salas and Atkins ( Principal coauthors: Assembly Members Gray and Perea ) ( Principal coauthor: Senator Vidak ) FEBRUARY 21, 2013 An act to add Section 27513 10531.7 to the Government Water Code, relating to local officers. integrated regional water management plans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 739, as amended, Salas. Local officers: deputy coroner. Integrated Regional Water Management Plans: conveyance projects. Existing law, the Integrated Regional Water Management Planning Act, authorizes a regional water management group to prepare and adopt an integrated regional water management plan with specified components relating to water supply and water quality. Existing law authorizes the Department of Water Resources to award grants to eligible projects consistent with an adopted integrated regional water management plan. This bill would declare the intent of the Legislature to enact future legislation that would require the department to provide grants and expenditures, consistent with an integrated regional water management plan, for the planning, design, and construction of local and regional conveyance projects that support regional and interregional connectivity and water management and provide certain benefits. Existing law generally sets forth the duties of a coroner. Existing law specifically requires a coroner to hold an inquest under certain circumstances and authorizes a coroner holding an inquest to, among other things, issue subpoenas. This bill would, for purposes relating to the duty of a coroner to hold an inquest, provide that a coroner's appointed deputy or authorized deputy shall include a deputy coroner or part-time or volunteer personnel of the sheriff coroner's office who is a reserve officer, as specified. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 10531.7 is added to the Water Code , to read: 10531.7. It is the intent of the Legislature to enact future legislation that would do all of the following: (a) Require the Department of Water Resources to provide grants and expenditures, consistent with an adopted integrated regional water management plan, for the planning, design, and construction of local and regional conveyance projects that support regional and interregional connectivity and water management and that provide one or more of the following benefits: (1) Improved regional or interregional water supply and water supply reliability. (2) Mitigation of conditions of groundwater overdraft, saline water intrusion, water quality degradation, or subsidence. (3) Adaptation to the impacts of hydrologic changes. (4) Improved water security from drought, natural disasters, or other events that could interrupt imported water supplies. (5) Provision of safe drinking water for disadvantaged communities and economically distressed areas. (b) Require a cost share of not less than 50 percent of the total project costs from nonstate sources and authorize the department to waive or reduce the cost share requirement for projects that directly benefit a disadvantaged community or an economically distressed area. SECTION 1. Section 27513 is added to the Government Code, to read: 27513. For purposes of this article only, a coroner's appointed deputy or authorized deputy shall include both of the following: (a) Any deputy coroner who is regularly employed and paid in that capacity. (b) Any part-time or volunteer personnel of the sheriff coroner's office who is a level I reserve officer, as described in paragraph (1) of subdivision (a) of Section 832.6 of the Penal Code. The Commission on Peace Officer Standards and Training shall not reimburse any individual agency for training or certification of any part-time or volunteer personnel.