California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB745 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill June 11, 2014

Chaptered

Bill June 23, 2014

Amended

Bill May 20, 2014
Bill May 6, 2014
Bill January 6, 2014