07/03/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 52, Statutes of 2013. | |||
07/03/2013 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/27/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:40 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/20/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 1460.). | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/14/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 14). | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 45. Noes 26. Page 878.) | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 2). | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | Read first time. To print. |