|
10/10/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 708, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2779.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1993.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/08/2013
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/08/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1477.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 16).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|