|
09/06/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 241, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 2655.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 21 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1877.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2013
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/16/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 25. Page 1462.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 6.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|