LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB777
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB777
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB777
Compare Versions
AB777 Enrolled April 29, 2014
AB777 Chaptered April 29, 2014
AB777 Amended February 19, 2014
AB777 Amended August 26, 2013
AB777 Amended May 21, 2013
AB777 Amended April 16, 2013
AB777 Amended March 19, 2013
AB777 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB777 Enrolled April 29, 2014
AB777 Chaptered April 29, 2014
AB777 Amended February 19, 2014
AB777 Amended August 26, 2013
AB777 Amended May 21, 2013
AB777 Amended April 16, 2013
AB777 Amended March 19, 2013
AB777 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare