Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/29/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1150.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|