LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB792
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB792
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB792
Compare Versions
AB792 Chaptered October 4, 2013
AB792 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB792 Amended August 29, 2013
AB792 Amended July 9, 2013
AB792 Amended June 25, 2013
AB792 Amended May 6, 2013
AB792 Amended April 1, 2013
AB792 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB792 Chaptered October 4, 2013
AB792 Enrolled September 18, 2013
AB792 Amended August 29, 2013
AB792 Amended July 9, 2013
AB792 Amended June 25, 2013
AB792 Amended May 6, 2013
AB792 Amended April 1, 2013
AB792 Introduced February 21, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare