|
09/20/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 320, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 1990.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/13/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 1381.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|