Senate | 06/04/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1263.) | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 30). | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | Read first time. To print. |