|
06/24/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 17, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2013
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1933.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1258.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2013
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 996.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|