Senate
|
08/13/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2014
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2014
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Galgiani.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2014
|
From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2013
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Hill.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1343.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|