Senate | 06/19/2014 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/17/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | ||
Senate | 05/09/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1326.) | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | Read first time. To print. |