Senate | 06/27/2013 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2013 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 06/03/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 19. Page 1874.) | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/24/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 24). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2013 | Read first time. To print. |