California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB852 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 21, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 21, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2014

Amended

Bill August 5, 2014
Bill June 15, 2014
Bill April 9, 2014
Bill September 12, 2013
Bill September 3, 2013
Bill July 10, 2013
Bill June 25, 2013
Bill April 16, 2013
Bill April 1, 2013