Assembly | 02/03/2014 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/29/2013 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Williams. | ||
Assembly | 05/13/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | ||
Assembly | 04/01/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2013 | Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and L. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |