Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2014
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3685.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/21/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/17/2014
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2014
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 13).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/15/2013
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|