Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2014 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2013 | From committee: Amend and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 1). | ||
Assembly | 04/11/2013 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 04/03/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | ||
Assembly | 01/11/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | ||
Assembly | 01/10/2013 | Read first time. To print. |