LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB899
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB899
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB899
Compare Versions
AB899 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB899 Enrolled September 20, 2013
AB899 Amended September 6, 2013
AB899 Amended September 3, 2013
AB899 Amended July 11, 2013
AB899 Amended June 26, 2013
AB899 Amended May 24, 2013
AB899 Amended May 6, 2013
AB899 Amended April 25, 2013
AB899 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB899 Chaptered October 10, 2013
AB899 Enrolled September 20, 2013
AB899 Amended September 6, 2013
AB899 Amended September 3, 2013
AB899 Amended July 11, 2013
AB899 Amended June 26, 2013
AB899 Amended May 24, 2013
AB899 Amended May 6, 2013
AB899 Amended April 25, 2013
AB899 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare