|
09/11/2013
|
Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2013
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2013
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1878.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/11/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2013
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1343.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/06/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2013
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/16/2013
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/19/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/18/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/07/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|