LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB911
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB911
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB911
Compare Versions
AB911 Amended August 13, 2013
AB911 Amended July 10, 2013
AB911 Amended June 25, 2013
AB911 Amended May 29, 2013
AB911 Amended May 8, 2013
AB911 Amended April 24, 2013
AB911 Amended March 21, 2013
AB911 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB911 Amended August 13, 2013
AB911 Amended July 10, 2013
AB911 Amended June 25, 2013
AB911 Amended May 29, 2013
AB911 Amended May 8, 2013
AB911 Amended April 24, 2013
AB911 Amended March 21, 2013
AB911 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare