LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB924
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB924
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB924
Compare Versions
AB924 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB924 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB924 Amended July 9, 2013
AB924 Amended April 25, 2013
AB924 Amended March 21, 2013
AB924 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB924 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB924 Enrolled September 12, 2013
AB924 Amended July 9, 2013
AB924 Amended April 25, 2013
AB924 Amended March 21, 2013
AB924 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare