09/11/2013 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |||
08/14/2013 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |||
08/13/2013 | Vetoed by Governor. | |||
Assembly | 08/01/2013 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 1600.). | ||
Senate | 06/14/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2013 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 12). | ||
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2013 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 1222.) | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2013 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 5.) (April 16). | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |