California 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB935 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 22, 2013

Enrolled

Bill August 29, 2014

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2014

Amended

Bill August 21, 2014
Bill August 5, 2014
Bill June 9, 2014
Bill April 25, 2013
Bill March 18, 2013