Assembly | 02/03/2014 | Died on inactive file. | ||
Assembly | 05/31/2013 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Bonta. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2013 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 15). | ||
Assembly | 05/07/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (April 30). | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2013 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 23). | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2013 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and B.,P. & C.P. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |