|
09/26/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 587, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2014
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2014
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4718.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2014
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2014
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 26. Page 3685.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2014
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (January 23). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/14/2014
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/07/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2014
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/24/2013
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 26.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/22/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|