LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB979
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB979
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB979
Compare Versions
AB979 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB979 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB979 Amended May 24, 2013
AB979 Amended April 1, 2013
AB979 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 1 (Old)
AB979 Chaptered October 7, 2013
AB979 Enrolled September 5, 2013
AB979 Amended May 24, 2013
AB979 Amended April 1, 2013
AB979 Introduced February 22, 2013
Version 2 (New)
Compare