Assembly | 02/03/2014 | From committee without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 01/13/2014 | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/29/2013 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2013 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 04/16/2013 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/15/2013 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2013 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/25/2013 | Read first time. | ||
Assembly | 02/24/2013 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |