LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2013-2014 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA7
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA7
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2013-2014 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA7
Action History
Assembly
05/24/2013
In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Assembly
05/15/2013
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
Assembly
05/08/2013
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (May 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Assembly
04/04/2013
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and APPR.
Assembly
02/14/2013
From printer. May be heard in committee March 16.
Assembly
02/13/2013
Read first time. To print.