Senate | 06/16/2014 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Senate | 06/02/2014 | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. | ||
Senate | 05/15/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/05/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/05/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4765.) | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 30). | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/08/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/07/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/20/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/14/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Introduced. To print. |