Assembly
|
09/09/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 157, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/09/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Page 6483.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2014
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4824.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2014
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/30/2014
|
In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/18/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2014
|
In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2014
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/15/2014
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4934.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/08/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2014
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2014
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/23/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|