Assembly
|
09/02/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 145, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2014
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/14/2014
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4504.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/12/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2014
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2014
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5650.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/05/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/03/2014
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|