Assembly | 09/11/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 176, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/27/2014 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4903.) | ||
Senate | 08/22/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/05/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5849.) | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2). | ||
Assembly | 06/24/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 06/12/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/06/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/05/2014 | Introduced. To print. |