Assembly
|
09/11/2014
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 177, Statutes of 2014.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2014
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2014
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6639.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2014
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2014
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4903.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2014
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2014
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2014
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/18/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/05/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/04/2014
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2014
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5849.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2014
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2014
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2014
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2014
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2014
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2014
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|