Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 68, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/07/2013
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:40 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/03/2013
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2288.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2013
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/01/2013
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1607.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/24/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/22/2013
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1043.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/09/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/21/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/13/2013
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/12/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|