Assembly | 09/09/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 160, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/25/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2014 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4760.) | ||
Senate | 08/12/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/04/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5814.) | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26). | ||
Assembly | 06/19/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/17/2014 | Introduced. To print. |