Senate | 08/30/2014 | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Page 5002.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Amended and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 08/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6303.) | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19). | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 08/14/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 06/30/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 06/26/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2014 | Introduced. To print. |