Assembly | 09/11/2014 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 181, Statutes of 2014. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2014 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/29/2014 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/29/2014 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4994.) | ||
Senate | 08/22/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6303.) | ||
Assembly | 08/19/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19). | ||
Assembly | 08/18/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 08/07/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/04/2014 | Introduced. To print. |