California 2013 2013-2014 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR170 Introduced / Bill

Filed 08/04/2014

 BILL NUMBER: ACR 170INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Holden AUGUST 4, 2014 Relative to the Pasadena Police Agent Richard Morris Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 170, as introduced, Holden. Pasadena Police Agent Richard Morris Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 210 in the City of Pasadena as the Pasadena Police Agent Richard Morris Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. Fiscal committee: yes. WHEREAS, Pasadena Police Agent Richard Frank Morris was born on March 11, 1940 and grew up in Temple City and Rosemead, attending Muscatel Junior High School and Rosemead High School in the San Gabriel Valley; and WHEREAS, Richard Morris was an active youth involved in numerous community activities, school sports programs, and service activities; and WHEREAS, Between 1958 and 1960, Richard Morris attended Mt. San Antonio College, graduating with an Associate's Degree in Political Science prior to enlisting in the United State Marine Corps Reserve; and WHEREAS, Richard Morris directed his commitment to public service and sense of adventure into a career in police work, joining the Pasadena Police Department in February of 1962 and entering the basic training academy; and WHEREAS, Richard Morris graduated from the police academy training program on March 30, 1962, and began his career as a police officer in the City of Pasadena; and WHEREAS, Richard Morris was promoted to the rank of Police Agent in the Detective, Narcotics Unit in February of 1968; and WHEREAS, Throughout his tenure with the Pasadena Police Department, Police Agent Morris was regarded as a rising star within the police force; and WHEREAS, Police Agent Morris was protecting the ideals and values of the Pasadena community when he was shot and killed in the line of duty on March 13, 1969, while pursuing an assault suspect; and WHEREAS, The death of Police Agent Morris touched many people in Pasadena; and WHEREAS, Police Agent Morris is remembered within the City of Pasadena for his honor, courage, and commitment to the residents of the City of Pasadena; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 210 from Rosemead Boulevard on the east to Allen Avenue on the west in the City of Pasadena as the Pasadena Police Agent Richard Morris Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of erecting appropriate signs, consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system, showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Director of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.