Assembly | 08/05/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/01/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/01/2013 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1608.) | ||
Senate | 06/25/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/24/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/11/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/29/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2013 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2013 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1476.) | ||
Assembly | 05/09/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 8). | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 04/23/2013 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/22/2013 | Introduced. To print. |