Assembly | 09/27/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 135, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Assembly | 09/27/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2013 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2342.) | ||
Senate | 09/09/2013 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2013 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/08/2013 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2482.) | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (July 3). | ||
Assembly | 06/18/2013 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2013 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 04/30/2013 | Introduced. To print. |