BILL NUMBER: ACR 57CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 136 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 27, 2013 ADOPTED IN SENATE SEPTEMBER 11, 2013 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 8, 2013 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Jones MAY 1, 2013 Relative to the James Craig Schmidt Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST ACR 57, Jones. James Craig Schmidt Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 94 in the County of San Diego as the James Craig Schmidt Memorial Highway. The measure would request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering that cost, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, James Craig Schmidt was born on September 27, 1927, in Peoria, Illinois, and after graduating from high school, enlisted in the United States Navy, and later attended Illinois Wesleyan University, the University of Illinois, and De Paul University Law School, becoming a member of the Illinois State Bar and later the California State Bar; and WHEREAS, Mr. Schmidt moved to San Diego in 1958, married Jerrie Bond, and began his career in the savings and loan industry, becoming legal counsel and senior vice president with Home Federal Savings and Loan before later joining San Diego Federal Savings and Loan as executive vice president-managing officer; and WHEREAS, Mr. Schmidt was appointed as Assistant Secretary for Business and Transportation under Governor Reagan in 1967, and was later appointed to the California Toll Bridge Authority and the State Transportation Board; and WHEREAS, Mr. Schmidt was involved in local transportation issues for many years in the County of San Diego, was instrumental in the removal of tolls from the San Diego-Coronado Bridge, and was a long-time board member of the San Diego Highway Development Association and the first recipient of its lifetime achievement award in 2011; and WHEREAS, Mr. Schmidt has a distinguished record of community service, as a member of many organizations and the recipient of numerous awards, including the designation by the City of San Diego of a James C. Schmidt Day in 2000 for his service and dedication to the city; and WHEREAS, As an avid sports fan, Mr. Schmidt attended every game of the San Diego Chargers from the date of their first game in San Diego in 1961, and helped launch the first Holiday Bowl in San Diego in 1978 and served as President of the 1986 Holiday Bowl and Chairman of the 1987 Holiday Bowl; and WHEREAS, As a guest commentator for the Daily Transcript, Mr. Schmidt wrote regular articles on a wide variety of topics, including sports, transportation, housing, real estate, desalinization, and grand jury reports, helping to educate readers and document local history; and WHEREAS, Mr. Schmidt was well known and respected in the business and civic communities, and will be remembered for his friendliness and for never forgetting a face or name; and WHEREAS, Mr. Schmidt is survived by his wife Jerrie, of 54 years, and three daughters, Sandy, Julie, and Suzanne, two grandchildren, Michelle and Spencer, and a sister, Marilee; and WHEREAS, It is appropriate to honor Mr. Schmidt by designating a portion of State Highway Route 94 is his memory; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 94 between Bancroft Drive and Avocado Boulevard in the County of San Diego as the James Craig Schmidt Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.