Assembly
|
09/27/2013
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 140, Statutes of 2013.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/27/2013
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2013
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2013
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 7. Page 2396.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2013
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2013
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (September 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2013
|
Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 3. Page 2116.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 2. Page 2117.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2013
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2013
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2013
|
Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 2666.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/21/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/13/2013
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2013
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2013
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/12/2013
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|