Assembly | 09/27/2013 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 151, Statutes of 2013. | ||
Assembly | 09/27/2013 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/12/2013 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2013 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. From committee: Ordered to third reading. Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2428.) | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 11). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3245.) Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Page 3245.) | ||
Assembly | 09/09/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2013 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2013 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/27/2013 | Introduced. To print. |