Senate | 05/23/2014 | From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Lieu. | ||
Senate | 05/20/2014 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/19/2014 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/06/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2014 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2014 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/21/2014 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4479.) | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2014 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). | ||
Assembly | 03/25/2014 | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (March 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/13/2014 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 03/12/2014 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/14/2014 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2014 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2014 | Introduced. To print. |