Senate | 08/21/2013 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Senate | 08/14/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | ||
Senate | 08/12/2013 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/05/2013 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2388.) | ||
Assembly | 07/02/2013 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). | ||
Assembly | 06/10/2013 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 05/28/2013 | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. | ||
Assembly | 05/21/2013 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 05/20/2013 | Introduced. To print. |